Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Alberto González Juárez

Bishop of Tuxtepec, Oaxaca, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1967 Born
12 Feb 199527.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Tuxtla Gutiérrez, Chiapas, México
8 Dec 199527.9Ordained PriestPriest of Tuxtla Gutiérrez, Chiapas, México
6 Jun 201547.4AppointedBishop of Tuxtepec, Oaxaca, México
22 Jul 201547.5Ordained BishopBishop of Tuxtepec, Oaxaca, México

MicroData Summary for José Alberto González Juárez
Bishop José Alberto González Juárez (born ) Bishop of Tuxtepec

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEl Parral

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tuxtepec.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Jun 2015
  • od/c1: CB, 7 Jun 2015
  • ob: CB, 13 Jun 2015
  • c2: CB, 25 Jun 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,551

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast