Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop St. Antonino Fantosati, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Southern Hunan {Hu-Nan Meridionale}

Titular Bishop of Adraa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1842BornSanta Maria in Valle, Italy
28 Jul 186219.7ProfessedMember of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
13 Jun 186522.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
5 Apr 189249.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southern Hunan {Hu-Nan Meridionale}, China
5 Apr 189249.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Adraa
11 Nov 189250.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adraa
27 Nov 189250.1InstalledVicar Apostolic of Southern Hunan {Hu-Nan Meridionale}, China
7 Jul 190057.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Southern Hunan {Hu-Nan Meridionale}, China
24 Nov 1946Beatified
1 Oct 2000Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Antonino Fantosati:
Bishop St. Antonino Fantosati O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Southern Hunan {Hu-Nan Meridionale}

  • a priest for 35.0 years
  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 76
  • op/i: CB, 18 Oct 2015
  • op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 5 Jan 2016