Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nikola Eterović

Apostolic Nuncio to Germany

Titular Archbishop of Cibalae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1951 BornPucisca
26 Jun 197726.4Ordained PriestPriest of Hvar (-Brac e Vis), Croatia
22 May 199948.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Siscia
22 May 199948.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Ukraine
10 Jul 199948.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Siscia
11 Feb 200453.1AppointedSecretary General of the Synod of Bishops
30 Nov 200958.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cibalae
21 Sep 201362.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany

MicroData Summary for Nikola Eterović:
Archbishop Nikola Eterović (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Germany

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Germany.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,584
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 12 Apr 2014