Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leon Mały

Auxiliary Bishop of Lviv

Titular Bishop of Tabunia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1958 BornBar
7 Jun 198425.8Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv, Ukraine
4 May 200243.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine
4 May 200243.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tabunia
20 Jun 200243.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tabunia

MicroData Summary for Leon Mały:
Bishop Leon Mały (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lviv

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Lviv.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,204

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013