Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Slobodan Štambuk

Bishop Emeritus of Hvar (-Brac e Vis), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1941 Born
3 Jul 196625.3Ordained PriestPriest of Hvar (-Brac e Vis), Croatia
30 Mar 198948.0AppointedBishop of Hvar (-Brac e Vis), Croatia
30 Apr 198948.1Ordained BishopBishop of Hvar (-Brac e Vis), Croatia
9 Mar 201877.0RetiredBishop of Hvar (-Brac e Vis), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Slobodan Štambuk (VIAF: 305495594)
Bishop Slobodan Štambuk (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Hvar (-Brac e Vis)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSelca
Ordained BishopSt. Stephen's, Cathedral, Hvar, Diocese of Hvar (-Brac e Vis)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Hvar (-Brac e Vis).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,456
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast