Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Celestin Bezmalinovic, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Hvar (-Brac e Vis), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1912Born
3 Jul 193826.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
7 Aug 195644.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hvar (-Brac e Vis), Croatia
7 Aug 195644.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Hadrumetum
30 Sep 195644.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hadrumetum
196754.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Hvar (-Brac e Vis), Croatia
6 Jun 197058.0SucceededBishop of Hvar (-Brac e Vis), Croatia
30 Mar 198976.8RetiredBishop of Hvar (-Brac e Vis), Croatia
4 Jun 199482.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Hvar (-Brac e Vis), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Celestin Bezmalinovic
Bishop Celestin Bezmalinovic O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Hvar (-Brac e Vis)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSelca

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 37.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 85

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast