Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ante Juric

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Split-Makarska


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1922BornVranjic
18 May 194725.0Ordained PriestPriest of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia
10 Sep 198866.3AppointedArchbishop of Split-Makarska, Croatia
16 Oct 198866.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Split-Makarska, Croatia
21 Jun 200078.1RetiredArchbishop of Split-Makarska, Croatia
20 Mar 201289.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Split-Makarska, Croatia

MicroData Summary for Ante Juric:
Archbishop Ante Juric (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Split-Makarska

  • a priest for 64.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,128
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 21 Sep 2013