Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vitorino José Pereira Soares

Auxiliary Bishop of Porto, Portugal

Titular Bishop of Gisipa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1960 Born
14 Jul 198524.7Ordained PriestPriest of Porto, Portugal
17 Jul 201958.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Porto, Portugal
17 Jul 201958.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Gisipa
29 Sep 201958.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gisipa

MicroData Summary for Vitorino José Pereira Soares
Bishop Vitorino José Pereira Soares (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Porto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLuzim (Penafiel), Diocese of Porto
Ordained BishopCathedral, Porto, Diocese of Porto

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Porto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Jul 2019
  • ob: CB, 17 Jul 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Number 20,247

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 8 Oct 2019

Quantcast