Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Qichun [Kichow]

Dioecesis Chiceuvensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Hankow [Hankou]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 28,000 (10,815 Square Miles)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Hwangchow
18 July 1929ErectedMission "Sui Iuris" of Hwangchow (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Hwangchow
1 June 1932ElevatedMission "Sui Iuris" of Hwangchow Prefecture Apostolic of Hwangchow
Vicariate Apostolic of Kichow [Qichun]
27 January 1936ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Hwangchow Vicariate Apostolic of Kichow [Qichun]
Diocese of Qichun [Kichow]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Kichow [Qichun] Diocese of Qichun [Kichow]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Qichun [Kichow]
195015,9463,747,308.4%ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.7, 12 Feb 2013; data: 18 Feb 2013