Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Joseph Dunne

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Dublin

Titular Bishop of Nara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1891BornDublin
1 Nov 191322.4Ordained PriestPriest of Dublin, Ireland
8 Aug 194655.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dublin, Ireland
8 Aug 194655.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Nara
11 Oct 194655.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nara
11 Oct 197988.3ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Dublin, Ireland
16 Mar 198896.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Dublin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Patrick Joseph Dunne
Bishop Patrick Joseph Dunne (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Dublin

  • a priest for 74.3 years
  • a bishop for 41.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 81

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 2 May 2016