Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dermot Patrick O’Mahony

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Dublin, Ireland

Titular Bishop of Thiava


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1935Born
29 May 196025.2Ordained PriestPriest
13 Feb 197539.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dublin, Ireland
13 Feb 197539.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Thiava
13 Apr 197540.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thiava
7 Jun 199661.3ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Dublin, Ireland
10 Dec 201580.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Dublin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Dermot Patrick O’Mahony
Bishop Dermot Patrick O’Mahony (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Dublin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEnniskillen

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 40.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 11 Dec 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018