Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Collier

Deceased

Bishop of Ossory, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1880Born
24 Jun 190727.4Ordained PriestPriest of Ossory, Ireland
15 May 192848.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ossory, Ireland
15 May 192848.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Hemeria (Himeria)
5 Aug 192848.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hemeria (Himeria)
1 Oct 192848.7SucceededBishop of Ossory, Ireland
10 Jan 196483.9DiedBishop of Ossory, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Patrick Collier
Bishop Patrick Collier (born , died ) Bishop of Ossory

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCamross, Mountrath, Leix

  • a priest for 56.5 years
  • a bishop for 35.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 6 Jul 2018

Quantcast