Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Timothy Phelim O’Shea, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Livingstone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1902BornClondrohid, Ireland
29 Aug 192826.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
24 May 195047.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Livingstone, Zambia
24 May 195047.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierocaesarea
8 Sep 195048.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hierocaesarea
25 Apr 195956.8AppointedBishop of Livingstone, Zambia
18 Nov 197472.4ResignedBishop of Livingstone, Zambia
26 May 197976.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Livingstone, Zambia

MicroData Summary for Timothy Phelim O’Shea:
Bishop Timothy Phelim O’Shea O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Livingstone

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 28.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013