Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Urban Charles Joseph Murphy, C.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Gaborone, Botswana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1919Born
25 May 194525.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
24 Apr 195939.7AppointedPrefect of Bechuanaland, Botswana
5 Aug 196647.0AppointedBishop of Gaberones, Botswana
14 Sep 196647.1Ordained BishopBishop of Gaberones, Botswana
28 Feb 198161.6DiedBishop of Gaborone, Botswana

MicroData Summary for Urban Charles Joseph Murphy
Bishop Urban Charles Joseph Murphy C.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Gaborone

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDublin, Ireland

  • a priest for 35.7 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast