Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kazimirs Dulbinskis

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Riga

Titular Bishop of Gerara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1906BornVilaka
8 May 193225.9Ordained PriestPriest of Riga, Latvia
19 Jul 194640.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Riga, Latvia
19 Jul 194640.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Gerara
25 Jul 194741.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gerara
17 Oct 199185.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Riga, Latvia

MicroData Summary for Kazimirs Dulbinskis:
Bishop Kazimirs Dulbinskis (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Riga

  • a priest for 59.4 years
  • a bishop for 44.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1991
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,904
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 2 Jul 2015