Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Jacarezinho

Dioecesis Iacarezinhoënsis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Antônio Braz Benevente, Bishop
  • Fernando José Penteado, Bishop Emeritus
  • Conrado Walter, S.A.C., Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 10 May 1926
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Londrina
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Parana
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 13,369 (5,163 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Sul II
  • Mailing Address: Curia Diocesana, C.P. 001, Av. Getulio Vargas 262, 86400-000 Jacarezinho, PR, Brazil
  • Telephone: (043)3525-0707

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
10 May 1926ErectedDiocese of Curitiba Diocese of Jacarezinho (erected)
1 February 1956Territory LostDiocese of Jacarezinho Diocese of Londrina (erected)
1 February 1956Territory LostDiocese of Jacarezinho Diocese of Maringá (erected)
26 May 1973Territory LostDiocese of Jacarezinho Diocese of Cornélio Procópio (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1948500,000600,00083.3%11354610,869114925ap1951
1966700,000900,00077.8%3042729,7224615239ap1967
1968830,000930,00089.2%28487610,9216518741ap1971
1976400,000461,77586.6%2226488,3332615529ap1977
1980532,000584,00091.1%2529549,8512914030ap1981
1990395,000432,00091.4%4719665,9841913635ap1991
1999375,826416,67490.2%6212745,0781210236ap2000
2000366,485418,84987.5%6612784,698128237ap2001
2001370,527424,25387.3%5910695,369108139ap2002
2002375,400430,00087.3%5910695,440108140ap2003
2003366,485418,84987.5%5511665,552117140ap2004
2004371,504426,57787.1%7111824,530117240ap2005
2006380,000437,00087.0%7512874,367127140ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.7, 12 Feb 2013; data: 18 Feb 2013