Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adimir Antônio Mazali

Bishop of Erexim, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1966 Born
12 Jul 199226.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Cascavel, Parana, Brazil
5 Dec 199226.5Ordained PriestPriest of Cascavel, Parana, Brazil
15 Apr 202053.9AppointedBishop of Erexim, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
20 Jun 202054.0Ordained BishopBishop of Erexim, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
12 Jul 202054.1InstalledBishop of Erexim, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Adimir Antônio Mazali
Bishop Adimir Antônio Mazali (born ) Bishop of Erexim

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOuro Verde do Piquiri, Diocese of Toledo, Parana
Ordained DeaconNossa Senhora da Penha, Church, Corbélia, Archdiocese of Cascavel, Parana
Ordained PriestNossa Senhora da Penha, Church, Corbélia, Archdiocese of Cascavel, Parana
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora Aparecida, Cathedral, Cascavel, Archdiocese of Cascavel, Parana

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Erexim.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Apr 2020
  • od/c1/ob/i: CB, 15 Apr 2020
  • c2+: CB, 7 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 21 Jun 2020

Quantcast