Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Javier Del Valle Paredes

Bishop Emeritus of Campo Mourão, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1942 Born
3 Jul 197330.5Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jan 199148.1IncardinatedPriest of Campo Mourão, Parana, Brazil
24 Dec 200866.0AppointedBishop of Campo Mourão, Parana, Brazil
27 Feb 200966.2Ordained BishopBishop of Campo Mourão, Parana, Brazil
6 Dec 201775.0RetiredBishop of Campo Mourão, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Francisco Javier Del Valle Paredes
Bishop Francisco Javier Del Valle Paredes (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Campo Mourão

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIsla Pocú, Paraguay
Ordained BishopSão José, Cathedral, Campo Mourão, Diocese of Campo Mourão, Parana

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Campo Mourão.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Dec 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,057
  • r: Bollettino, 6 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast