Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ottorino Assolari, C.S.F.

Bishop of Serrinha, Bahia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1946 Born
8 Sep 197327.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregazione Sacra Famiglia di Bergamo
21 Sep 200559.6AppointedBishop of Serrinha, Bahia, Brazil
25 Nov 200559.8Ordained BishopBishop of Serrinha, Bahia, Brazil
18 Dec 200559.8InstalledBishop of Serrinha, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Ottorino Assolari
Bishop Ottorino Assolari C.S.F. (born ) Bishop of Serrinha

EventPlace
Birth PlaceScanzorosciate, Diocese of Bergamo, Italy
Ordained BishopSão José, Cathedral, Campo Mourão, Diocese of Campo Mourão, Parana

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Serrinha.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2005
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 15,010
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2,011, Page 685
  • bpd: AM, 8 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast