Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Denzil Reginald D’Souza

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Aizawl


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1929BornKolkata
13 May 195525.8Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jun 196939.9AppointedBishop of Silchar, India
23 Nov 196940.3Ordained BishopBishop of Silchar, India
18 Oct 200071.2RetiredBishop of Aizawl, India
25 Oct 200273.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Aizawl, India

MicroData Summary for Denzil Reginald D’Souza:
Bishop Denzil Reginald D’Souza (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Aizawl

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015