Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste du Plessis d’Argentré

Deceased

Bishop of Sées


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1720BornArgentré
28 Feb 177453.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Thagaste
20 Mar 177453.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thagaste
17 Sep 177554.8SelectedBishop of Sées, France
18 Dec 177555.1ConfirmedBishop of Sées, France
24 Feb 180584.3DiedBishop of Sées, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste du Plessis d’Argentré
Bishop Jean-Baptiste du Plessis d’Argentré (born , died ) Bishop of Sées

  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1774, Number 8
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 362, and Page 398

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 28 Feb 2016