Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinand Hermann Maria von Lüninck

Deceased

Bishop of Münster


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1756³BornGleuel
16 Dec 179438.8SelectedBishop of Corvey, Germany
1 Jun 179539.2ConfirmedBishop of Corvey, Germany
6 Aug 179539.4Ordained PriestPriest
6 Sep 179539.5Ordained BishopBishop of Corvey, Germany
28 Aug 182064.5AppointedBishop of Münster, Germany
7 Jul 182165.3InstalledBishop of Münster, Germany
18 Mar 182569.0DiedBishop of Münster, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ferdinand Hermann Maria von Lüninck
Bishop Ferdinand Hermann Maria von Lüninck (born , died ) Bishop of Münster

  • a priest for 29.6 years
  • a bishop for 29.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 269
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1795, Number 21
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 182

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 28 Feb 2016