Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Jacques-François de Vocance

Deceased

Bishop of Senez, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1704¹Born
11 Jan 174137.0SelectedBishop of Senez, France
29 May 174137.4ConfirmedBishop of Senez, France
8 Oct 174137.7Ordained BishopBishop of Senez, France
14 May 175652.3DiedBishop of Senez, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis-Jacques-François de Vocance
Bishop Louis-Jacques-François de Vocance (born 1704, died ) Bishop of Senez

EventPlace
Birth PlaceViviers

  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 53
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 375

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast