Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Auguste-César d’Hervilly de Devise

Deceased

Bishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1688BornDevise
4 Mar 173849.4SelectedBishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer), France
27 Jun 173849.7ConfirmedBishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer), France
14 Sep 173850.0Ordained BishopBishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer), France
11 Oct 174254.0DiedBishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer), France

MicroData Summary for Auguste-César d’Hervilly de Devise:
Bishop Auguste-César d’Hervilly de Devise (born , died ) Bishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer)

  • a bishop for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1738, Number 22
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 126

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015