Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Joseph-Gaston de Partz de Pressy

Deceased

Bishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1712Born
17 Dec 174230.2SelectedBishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer), France
15 Jul 174330.8ConfirmedBishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer), France
15 Sep 174330.9Ordained BishopBishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer), France
8 Oct 178977.0DiedBishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer), France

MicroData Summary for François-Joseph-Gaston de Partz de Pressy
Bishop François-Joseph-Gaston de Partz de Pressy (born , died ) Bishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEsquire

  • a bishop for 46.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1743, Number 34
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 126

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast