Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles de La Cropte de Chanterac

Deceased

Bishop of Alet


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1724BornChanterac
1 Jan 176338.7SelectedBishop of Alet, France
16 May 176339.1ConfirmedBishop of Alet, France
19 Jun 176339.2Ordained BishopBishop of Alet, France
27 Apr 179369.0DiedBishop of Alet, France

MicroData Summary for Charles de La Cropte de Chanterac:
Bishop Charles de La Cropte de Chanterac (born , died ) Bishop of Alet

  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 206
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1763, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 29 Nov 2015