Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Ludwig Buchkremer

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Aachen, Germany

Titular Bishop of Aggar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1899Born
10 Aug 192323.8Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
28 Oct 196162.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Aachen, Germany
28 Oct 196162.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Aggar
21 Dec 196162.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aggar
4 Oct 197980.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Aachen, Germany
24 Aug 198686.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Aachen, Germany

MicroData Summary for Joseph Ludwig Buchkremer
Bishop Joseph Ludwig Buchkremer (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Aachen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAachen

  • a priest for 63.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast