Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop James Patrick Green

Apostolic Nuncio to Sweden

Titular Archbishop of Altinum

Apostolic Nuncio to Denmark

Apostolic Nuncio to Iceland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1950 Born
15 May 197625.9Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
17 Aug 200656.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Altinum
17 Aug 200656.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to South Africa
17 Aug 200656.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Namibia
17 Aug 200656.2AppointedApostolic Delegate to Botswana
6 Sep 200656.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Altinum
6 Sep 200656.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Lesotho
23 Sep 200656.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Swaziland
7 Feb 200958.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Botswana
15 Oct 201161.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Peru
6 Apr 201766.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Sweden
6 Apr 201766.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Iceland
13 Jun 201767.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Denmark

MicroData Summary for James Patrick Green
Archbishop James Patrick Green (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Sweden

EventPlace
Birth PlacePhiladelphia

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Sweden.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Aug 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Sep 2006
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 Sep 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,234
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2011
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Apr 2017
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Jun 2017