Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hilarius Moa Nurak, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pangkal-Pinang


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1943BornWaekabubak
8 Jan 197228.8ProfessedMember of Society of the Divine Word
2 Aug 197229.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
30 Mar 198744.1AppointedBishop of Pangkal-Pinang, Indonesia
2 Aug 198744.4Ordained BishopBishop of Pangkal-Pinang, Indonesia
29 Apr 201673.1DiedBishop of Pangkal-Pinang, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Hilarius Moa Nurak
Bishop Hilarius Moa Nurak S.V.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Pangkal-Pinang

  • a priest for 43.7 years
  • a bishop for 28.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,904
  • d: CB, 29 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 30 Apr 2016