Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Aloysius Sudarso, S.C.I.

Archbishop of Palembang


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1945 BornYogyakarta
14 Dec 197227.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
17 Nov 199347.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop
17 Nov 199347.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Bavagaliana
25 Mar 199448.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bavagaliana
20 May 199751.4AppointedBishop of Palembang, Indonesia
1 Jul 200357.6AppointedArchbishop of Palembang, Indonesia
6 Jul 201266.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Tanjungkarang, Indonesia
10 Oct 201367.8ResignedApostolic Administrator of Tanjungkarang, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Aloysius Sudarso:
Archbishop Aloysius Sudarso S.C.I. (born ) Archbishop of Palembang

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Palembang.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138, Number 12,306
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Jul 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 10 Oct 2013