Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raúl Alfonso Carrillo Martínez

Vicar Apostolic of Puerto Gaitán, Colombia

Titular Bishop of Afufenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1964 Born
14 May 199025.6Ordained PriestPriest of Zipaquirá, Colombia
8 Apr 201651.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Puerto Gaitán, Colombia
8 Apr 201651.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Afufenia
22 May 201651.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Afufenia
16 Jun 201651.7InstalledVicar Apostolic of Puerto Gaitán, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Raúl Alfonso Carrillo Martínez
Bishop Raúl Alfonso Carrillo Martínez (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Puerto Gaitán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUbaté

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Puerto Gaitán.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Apr 2016
  • ob: CB, 9 Apr 2016
  • c2: CB, 21 Apr 2016
  • i: CB, 4 May 2016
  • c3+: CB, 20 May 2016
  • c56: CB, 22 May 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,918

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018