Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerard Francis Loft, S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Auki, Solomon Islands


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1933Born
20 Jul 195825.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
5 Dec 198350.6AppointedBishop of Auki, Solomon Islands
11 Mar 198450.9Ordained BishopBishop of Auki, Solomon Islands
19 Oct 200471.5ResignedBishop of Auki, Solomon Islands
4 Feb 200773.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Auki, Solomon Islands

MicroData Summary for Gerard Francis Loft
Bishop Gerard Francis Loft S.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Auki

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWellington, New Zealand

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast