Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Canberra-Goulburn

Archidioecesis Camberrensis-Gulburnensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 19 June 2006
  • Immediately Subject to the Holy See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Australia
  • Square Kilometers: 88,000 (33,990 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.cg.catholic.org.au/
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, G.P.O. Box 89, Commonwealth Avenue, Canberra, A.C.T. 2601, Australia
  • Telephone: (02)6201.9811
  • Fax: 6247.9636; 6248.0287

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Goulburn
17 November 1862ErectedArchdiocese of Sydney Diocese of Goulburn (erected)
10 May 1887Territory LostDiocese of Armidale
Diocese of Bathurst
Diocese of Goulburn
Diocese of Wilcannia (erected)
28 July 1917Territory LostDiocese of Goulburn Diocese of Wagga Wagga (erected)
Archdiocese of Canberra (and Goulburn)
5 February 1948ElevatedDiocese of Goulburn Archdiocese of Canberra (and Goulburn)
Archdiocese of Canberra-Goulburn
19 June 2006Name ChangedArchdiocese of Canberra (and Goulburn) Archdiocese of Canberra-Goulburn

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Canberra (and Goulburn)
195043,500167,47126.0%85201054145141836ap1951
195860,211209,98128.7%100241244857740144ap1960
196678,820286,08227.6%1156117644710651951ap1967
196885,000310,00027.4%1106417448818252753ap1971
1980142,000440,00032.3%94401341,05911639561ap1981
1990137,500479,20028.7%81371181,1659129462ap1991
1999158,000546,00028.9%89421311,20616221659ap2000
2000158,500571,00027.8%83401231,28816122259ap2001
2001159,600596,00026.8%98421401,14026321759ap2002
2002162,000547,04029.6%98301281,26534818059ap2003
2003161,000552,00029.2%97271241,29834523159ap2004
2004160,700551,40029.1%94251191,35044917458ap2005
Archdiocese of Canberra-Goulburn
2006159,670569,00028.1%96241201,33044116455ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 12 Sep 2013