Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Christopher Michael Cardone, O.P.

Archbishop of Honiara, Solomon Islands


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1957 Born
15 Aug 198123.6ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
30 May 198628.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
27 Mar 200143.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gizo, Solomon Islands
27 Mar 200143.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Thuburnica
9 Jun 200143.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thuburnica
19 Oct 200446.8AppointedBishop of Auki, Solomon Islands
22 Jun 201658.5AppointedArchbishop of Honiara, Solomon Islands
10 Sep 201658.7InstalledArchbishop of Honiara, Solomon Islands

MicroData Summary for Christopher Michael Cardone
Archbishop Christopher Michael Cardone O.P. (born ) Archbishop of Honiara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLong Island, NY, USA

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Honiara.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,990
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Jun 2016
  • i: CB, 7 Sep 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast