Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Sioux Falls

Dioecesis Siouxormensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Paul Joseph Swain, Bishop

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Dakota
12 August 1879ErectedDiocese of Saint Paul Vicariate Apostolic of Dakota (erected)
10 November 1889Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Dakota Diocese of Jamestown (erected)
Diocese of Sioux Falls
12 November 1889ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Dakota (Name changed and Vicariate raised to a Diocese) Diocese of Sioux Falls (erected)
4 August 1902Territory LostDiocese of Sioux Falls Diocese of Lead (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Sioux Falls
195074,294491,85215.1%128401684424621114ap1951
196695,000465,20020.4%1346720147228879123ap1967
1968100,350475,00021.1%12673199504108595113ap1971
197699,372482,00020.6%1176418154991552133ap1977
1980100,245484,00020.7%12957186538283487174ap1981
1990113,420507,00022.4%123481716631466405160ap1991
1999122,950503,00024.4%120401607682212430156ap2000
2000125,079503,00024.9%114401548122250380151ap2001
2001125,120503,00024.9%113381518282450405151ap2002
2002125,210539,32023.2%115361518292647392151ap2003
2003125,282524,15323.9%110341448702745392152ap2004
2004125,332524,15323.9%111381498413051363151ap2005
2010135,600550,00024.7%115291449413637299150ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 10 Nov 2013