Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paulinus Costa

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Dhaka, Bangladesh


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1936Born
21 Dec 196327.1Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jan 199659.2AppointedBishop of Rajshahi, Bangladesh
26 Apr 199659.5Ordained BishopBishop of Rajshahi, Bangladesh
9 Jul 200568.7AppointedArchbishop of Dhaka, Bangladesh
22 Oct 201175.0RetiredArchbishop of Dhaka, Bangladesh
3 Jan 201578.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Dhaka, Bangladesh

MicroData Summary for Paulinus Costa
Archbishop Paulinus Costa (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Dhaka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRangamatia

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Jul 2005
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 214
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Oct 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 145, Number 12,714
  • d: CB, 5 Jan 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 2 Feb 2017