Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Chattogram

Archidioecesis Chittagongensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Moses M. Costa, C.S.C., Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 28 December 2018
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Bangladesh
  • Square Kilometers: 23,460 (9,061 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, Bandel Road, Patharghata, P.O. Box 152, Chittagong 4000, Bangladesh
  • Telephone: (031)61.46.50

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Chittagong
25 May 1927ErectedDiocese of Dacca Diocese of Chittagong (erected)
9 July 1940Territory LostDiocese of Chittagong Prefecture Apostolic of Akyab (erected)
29 December 2015Territory LostDiocese of Chittagong Diocese of Barisal (erected)
Archdiocese of Chittagong
2 February 2017ElevatedDiocese of Chittagong Archdiocese of Chittagong
Archdiocese of Chattogram
28 December 2018Name ChangedArchdiocese of Chittagong Archdiocese of Chattogram

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Chittagong
195011,88812,891,650.1%62127440124210ap1951
197013,05313,600,000.1%7202748340819ap1971
198017,55723,000,000.1%1392279831489ap1981
199018,25020,686,883.1%81624760264810ap1991
199923,68925,529,062.1%13122594719729ap2000
200025,12926,039,640.1%1213251,00522739ap2001
200125,54728,500,000.1%1213251,021237910ap2002
200226,35229,070,000.1%1115261,013257410ap2003
200328,20629,600,000.1%1216281,007288010ap2004
200429,21230,000,000.1%1212241,217328010ap2005
200631,81331,200,000.1%1416301,060288610ap2007
201340,59635,308,680.1%2018381,068389914ap2014
201548,91719,188,306.3%108182,717106511bul:29dec2015
201629,76019,447,000.2%1210221,352236911ap2017
Archdiocese of Chittagong
Archdiocese of Chattogram

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_d, v3.2.7, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 13 Mar 2019

Quantcast