Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre de Beaupoil de Saint-Aulaire

Deceased

Bishop of Tarbes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1700¹BornPerigueux
17 Sep 174040.7SelectedBishop of Tarbes, France
19 Dec 174040.9ConfirmedBishop of Tarbes, France
5 Mar 174141.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tarbes, France
11 Jan 175151.0DiedBishop of Tarbes, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Beaupoil de Saint-Aulaire:
Bishop Pierre de Beaupoil de Saint-Aulaire (born 1700, died ) Bishop of Tarbes

  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 16
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 392

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015