Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Banjarmasin

Dioecesis Bangiarmasinus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 22 August 1973
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Samarinda
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Indonesia
  • Square Kilometers: 37,530 (14,495 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Jl. Brigjen H. Hasan Basri 48, Kayutangi-Banjarmasin 70124, Kalimantan Selatan, Indonesia
  • Telephone: (0511)330.57.33; 330.56.33
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Bandjarmasin
21 May 1938ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Dutch Borneo {Borneo Olandese} Prefecture Apostolic of Bandjarmasin (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Bandjarmasin
10 March 1949ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Bandjarmasin Vicariate Apostolic of Bandjarmasin
21 February 1955Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Bandjarmasin Vicariate Apostolic of Samarinda (erected)
Diocese of Bandjarmasin
3 January 1961ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Bandjarmasin Diocese of Bandjarmasin
Diocese of Banjarmasin
22 August 1973Name ChangedDiocese of Bandjarmasin Diocese of Banjarmasin
5 April 1993Territory LostDiocese of Banjarmasin Diocese of Palangkaraya (erected)
29 January 2003Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Banjarmasin (from Pontianak)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Bandjarmasin
19507,2231,670,000.4%1373819010182ap1951
Diocese of Bandjarmasin
19707,7781,969,677.4%11117072119ap1971
Diocese of Banjarmasin
198020,8812,700,000.8%19191,0993027ap1981
199048,3903,894,2301.2%23232,103287725ap1991
199924,0263,005,164.8%210122,00211548ap2000
200017,2783,202,300.5%312151,15114548ap2001
200117,2783,202,300.5%312151,15114548ap2002
200230,3323,069,7591.0%313161,89513579ap2003
200330,3323,569,759.8%314171,78414579ap2004
200413,6313,054,129.4%3161971716679ap2005
200618,2003,135,000.6%313161,13725759ap2007
201217,0513,680,000.5%7182568225829ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 8 Sep 2013