Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Samarinda

Archidioecesis Samarindaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 29 January 2003
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Indonesia
  • Square Kilometers: 114,810 (44,345 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Keuskupan Agung, Jl. D.I. Panjaitan 59A, Samarinda 75010, Kalimantan Timur, Indonesia
  • Telephone: (0541)28.60.60
  • Fax: 28.09.70

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Samarinda
21 February 1955ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Bandjarmasin Vicariate Apostolic of Samarinda (erected)
Diocese of Samarinda
3 January 1961ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Samarinda Diocese of Samarinda
9 January 2002Territory LostDiocese of Samarinda Diocese of Tanjung Selor (erected)
Archdiocese of Samarinda
29 January 2003ElevatedDiocese of Samarinda Archdiocese of Samarinda

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Samarinda
196914,500900,0001.6%1171880519238ap1971
198038,1701,065,0003.6%223251,526312114ap1981
199064,6531,662,4783.9%331341,901333823ap1991
1999125,2722,294,8415.5%13139,63636935ap2000
2000134,9372,294,8515.9%1536512,645507237ap2001
2001158,0532,637,7556.0%1535503,161497339ap2002
Archdiocese of Samarinda
200299,8881,538,6016.5%1912313,222265515ap2003
2003162,2571,483,71110.9%1321344,772257323ap2004
2004122,4282,374,7445.2%1421353,497257023ap2005
201097,1712,567,0003.8%1526412,370296625ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 19 Jul 2013