Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquim Mamede da Silva Leite

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Campinas

Titular Bishop of Sebaste in Phrygia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1876BornCampinas
24 May 190023.8Ordained PriestPriest of Espírito Santo, Brazil
7 Jun 191639.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Campinas, Brazil
7 Jun 191639.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Phrygia
13 Aug 191640.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Phrygia
28 Jan 191841.4AppointedBishop of Caratinga, Minas Gerais, Brazil
22 Mar 194770.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Campinas, Brazil

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Joaquim Mamede da Silva Leite:
Bishop Joaquim Mamede da Silva Leite (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Campinas

  • a priest for 46.8 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013