Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio Malan, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Petrolina, Pernambuco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1862BornSan Pietro Monterosso, Italy
28 Oct 188926.9Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
25 May 191451.4AppointedPrelate of Registro do Araguaia, Brazil
25 May 191451.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Amisus
26 Jul 191451.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amisus
3 Jan 192461.0AppointedBishop of Petrolina, Pernambuco, Brazil
28 Oct 193168.9DiedBishop of Petrolina, Pernambuco, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Malan:
Bishop Antônio Malan S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Petrolina

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 52
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013