Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Agostino Accoramboni

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Heliopolis in Phoenicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1823Born
19 Sep 184622.7Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 189672.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Heliopolis in Phoenicia
29 Jun 189672.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Heliopolis in Phoenicia
17 May 189975.3DiedTitular Archbishop of Heliopolis in Phoenicia

MicroData Summary for Agostino Accoramboni
Archbishop Agostino Accoramboni (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Heliopolis in Phoenicia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. John Lateran, Cathedral, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 301
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017