Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ricardo Pedro Chaves Pinto Filho, O. Praem.

Archbishop of Pouso Alegre, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1938 BornCapelinha
29 Jun 196728.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines
14 Mar 199051.6AppointedBishop of Leopoldina, Minas Gerais, Brazil
21 Apr 199051.7Ordained BishopBishop of Leopoldina, Minas Gerais, Brazil
16 Oct 199658.2AppointedArchbishop of Pouso Alegre, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Ricardo Pedro Chaves Pinto Filho:
Archbishop Ricardo Pedro Chaves Pinto Filho O. Praem. (born ) Archbishop of Pouso Alegre

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Pouso Alegre.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123, Number 11,064

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 6 Mar 2014