Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Montes Claros

Archidioecesis Montisclarensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 25 April 2001
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Minas Gerais
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 45,450 (17,555 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Leste II
  • Web Site: http://www.arquimoc.org.br/
  • Mailing Address: C.P. 40, Av. Coronel Prates 142, 39310-970 Montes Claros, MG, Brazil
  • Telephone: (038) 221-8728
  • Fax: 222-9434

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Montes Claros
10 December 1910ErectedDiocese of Diamantina Diocese of Montes Claros (erected)
1 March 1929Territory LostDiocese of Montes Claros
Diocese of Uberaba
Territorial Prelature of Paracatu (erected)
15 June 1957Territory LostDiocese of Montes Claros
Territorial Prelature of Paracatu
Diocese of Januária (erected)
5 July 2000Territory LostDiocese of Januária
Diocese of Montes Claros
Diocese of Janaúba (erected)
Archdiocese of Montes Claros
25 April 2001ElevatedDiocese of Montes Claros Archdiocese of Montes Claros

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Montes Claros
1950700,000701,00099.9%18153321,21284126ap1951
1965580,000600,00096.7%19183715,675187221ap1967
1968625,000650,00096.2%15233816,447316018ap1971
1976600,000660,00090.9%17183517,142285223ap1977
1980647,000704,00091.9%14213518,485344923ap1981
1987832,000902,00092.2%20244418,909339227ap1991
1999993,0001,078,00092.1%27235019,8603312934ap2000
2000650,000762,00085.3%23234614,13014211429ap2001
Archdiocese of Montes Claros
2001609,604762,00580.0%21244513,54614812731ap2002
2002609,604762,00580.0%24265012,19215310031ap2003
2003586,143732,67980.0%30235311,0598618042ap2004
2004549,509732,67975.0%3130619,0089498037ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 12 Jun 2013