Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Alves de Sà Trindade

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Montes Claros


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1912BornLagoa Dourada
27 Mar 193724.5Ordained PriestPriest
4 Sep 194835.9AppointedBishop of Bonfim, Bahia, Brazil
21 Nov 194836.1Ordained BishopBishop of Bonfim, Bahia, Brazil
27 May 195643.6AppointedBishop of Montes Claros, Brazil
1 Jun 198875.7RetiredBishop of Montes Claros, Brazil
8 Mar 200592.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Montes Claros, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Alves de Sà Trindade:
Bishop José Alves de Sà Trindade (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Montes Claros

  • a priest for 67.9 years
  • a bishop for 56.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 126
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Jun 2014