Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Geraldo Majela (João José) de Castro, O. Praem. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Montes Claros, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1930Born
8 Dec 195323.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines
15 Jun 198251.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Montes Claros, Brazil
8 Sep 198252.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Montes Claros, Brazil
1 Jun 198857.9SucceededBishop of Montes Claros, Brazil
25 Apr 200170.8AppointedArchbishop of Montes Claros, Minas Gerais, Brazil
7 Feb 200776.6RetiredArchbishop of Montes Claros, Minas Gerais, Brazil
14 May 201584.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Montes Claros, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Geraldo Majela (João José) de Castro
Archbishop Geraldo Majela (João José) de Castro O. Praem. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Montes Claros

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontes Claros

  • a priest for 61.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Feb 2007
  • d: CB, 14 May 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast