Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Luke Msusa, S.M.M.

Archbishop of Blantyre


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1962 BornIba
3 Aug 199634.5Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
19 Dec 200341.9AppointedBishop of Zomba, Malawi
17 Apr 200442.2Ordained BishopBishop of Zomba, Malawi
21 Nov 201351.8AppointedArchbishop of Blantyre, Malawi
8 Feb 201452.0InstalledArchbishop of Blantyre, Malawi

MicroData Summary for Thomas Luke Msusa:
Archbishop Thomas Luke Msusa S.M.M. (born ) Archbishop of Blantyre

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Blantyre.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,571
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2013
  • i: CB, 29 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 29 Dec 2013