Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Jeonju {Chonju, Jeon Ju}

Dioecesis Ieoniuensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Vincent Ri Pyung-ho, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 10 March 1962
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Kwangju
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Korea, Republic of
  • Square Kilometers: 8,050 (3,109 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.jcatholic.or.kr/
  • Mailing Address: Diocesan Office, Wansan-gu Seonosong-dong 560-6, Jeonju 561-812, Korea
  • Telephone: (063)285-0041
  • Fax: 285-0119

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Zenshu
13 April 1937ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Zenshu (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Chonju
12 July 1950Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of Zenshu Prefecture Apostolic of Chonju
Vicariate Apostolic of Chonju
21 January 1957ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Chonju Vicariate Apostolic of Chonju
Diocese of Jeonju {Chonju, Jeon Ju}
10 March 1962ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Chonju Diocese of Jeonju {Chonju, Jeon Ju}

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Jeonju {Chonju, Jeon Ju}
197052,1412,626,2222.0%502521,002410531ap1971
198063,6342,748,0002.3%78788159839ap1981
1990107,8742,157,3845.0%10521071,008217855ap1991
1999146,3772,014,5617.3%1472149982231565ap2000
2000151,2042,015,5347.5%1512153988229768ap2001
2001154,1322,006,5007.7%1542156988427171ap2002
2002157,5582,013,9237.8%1592161978529773ap2004
2004163,9331,962,8678.4%1741175936130981ap2005
2006171,1511,885,3359.1%1744178961432183ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 3 Dec 2011