Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Chacko Thottumarickal, S.V.D.

Bishop of Indore, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1949 Born
11 May 197930.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
25 Mar 200253.2AppointedBishop of Jhabua, India
7 Jun 200253.4Ordained BishopBishop of Jhabua, India
24 Oct 200859.7AppointedBishop of Indore, India
7 Dec 200859.9InstalledBishop of Indore, India

MicroData Summary for Chacko Thottumarickal
Bishop Chacko Thottumarickal S.V.D. (born ) Bishop of Indore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKalloorkad

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Indore.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Oct 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,196

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast